Identity area
Type of entity
Authorized form of name
Parallel form(s) of name
Standardized form(s) of name according to other rules
Other form(s) of name
Identifiers for corporate bodies
Description area
Dates of existence
History
The Nova Scotia Royal Commission on Automobile Insurance was created by Order-in-Council dated April 6, 1955 and amended on July 25, 1956. The April commission appointed Justice Eugene T. Parker, a judge of the Supreme Court of Nova Scotia, as sole commissioner, with Professor Wilfred Berman, of Dalhousie University, as statistician and Robert F. McLellan, Queens Counsel lawyer in Truro, as counsel for the Commission. Its mandate was to review all matters relating to insurance against liability for loss or damage to an automobile or to persons or property caused by an automobile, including a comparison with other jurisdictions, the possible need for compulsory auto insurance, and the practicality of establishing a provincially owned insurance department. Four days of public hearings were held at Halifax starting July 25, 1955, as well as informal meetings with insurance industry and other stakeholders. In August 1955 the Royal Commission visited Manitoba, Saskatchewan, and British Columbia for their experiences. Commissioner Parker resigned on December 2, 1955 due to ill health. The July 1956 Order-in-Council appointed Horace E. Read, Dean of Law at Dalhousie University Halifax, as chairperson with Professor Berman and Robert F. McLellan as co-commissioners. The mandate remained the same. In August 1956, the new Commission visited Maine and Massachusetts, USA, and in October 1956 held meetings with officials in New York state. They held more public hearings in Sydney and Yarmouth, NS, in September 1956, visited Ottawa and Toronto, and held informal meetings in Halifax with highway traffic specialists, government officials, and representatives from insurance companies, the adjusters’ association, and the automobile dealers’ association, ending in August 1957. Commissioner Read submitted their final report to His Honor Alistair Fraser, Lieutenant-Governor of Nova Scotia, on September 30, 1957 and the commission disbanded.
Places
Legal status
Functions, occupations and activities
Mandates/sources of authority
Internal structures/genealogy
General context
Relationships area
Access points area
Subject access points
Place access points
Occupations
Control area
Authority record identifier
Institution identifier
Rules and/or conventions used
Status
Level of detail
Dates of creation, revision and deletion
CREATED 2022-12-07 Karen White
Language(s)
- English
Script(s)
Sources
Contents of the fonds.